Primary tabs
THIS IS THE ARCHIVE FOR SAHRIS 1.0
THIS SITE IS NOW AN ARCHIVE AND IS NOT SUITABLE FOR MAKING APPLICATIONS
Please be aware that no content and application creation or changes to information on this version of SAHRIS will be retained.
To make applications or utilise SAHRIS for the creation of information, please use the new site:
https://sahris.org.za
Changes to SAHRIS!
The South African Heritage Resources Information System (SAHRIS) has undergone a generational upgrade and restructure. These changes to the site include, but are not limited to:
- A new & modernised look and layout
- Improved site usage flows with respect to applications and content creation
- Improved site performance and stability
Launch for the new version of SAHRIS occurred on Monday the 30th of October 2023.
The new site can be found here:
SAHRIS | SAHRIS
Displaying 161 - 180 of 2710
PermitID | HeritageAuthority | PermitHolder | Activities | PermitDate |
---|---|---|---|---|
375 | Amafa | Mduduzi Ntuli | Alteration, Additions |
26/06/2013 to 26/06/2016 |
376 | Amafa | Clyde Michael Barendse, NEVERLAND PROPERTIES 72 CC | Alteration, Additions |
26/06/2013 to 26/06/2016 |
377 | SAHRA | Wouter Fourie | Destruction |
14/02/2005 to 01/03/2007 |
378 | SAHRA | CK Brain | Excavation |
18/02/2005 to 01/03/2008 |
379 | SAHRA | Ryan Gibbon | Collection, Dating |
21/02/2005 to 01/03/2008 |
380 | SAHRA | MM Ndlovu | Destruction |
21/02/2005 to 01/03/2006 |
383 | SAHRA | N Mavrodinov | Collection |
01/09/2005 to 01/10/2006 |
384 | SAHRA | Anton van Vollenhoven | Excavation |
18/03/2005 to 01/04/2008 |
385 | SAHRA | A Keyser | Maintenance/Restoration |
10/05/2005 to 01/06/2006 |
386 | SAHRA | Mary Patrick | Remove from its original position |
03/03/2003 to 01/04/2007 |
388 | SAHRA | Anton Pelser |
01/07/2013 to 01/07/2014 |
|
390 | SAHRA | Stephany Potze | Export (Temporary) |
02/03/2005 to 01/04/2006 |
391 | SAHRA | Simon Hall | Collection, Excavation |
22/06/2005 to 01/07/2008 |
391 | SAHRA | Simon Hall | Collection, Excavation |
22/06/2005 to 01/07/2008 |
392 | SAHRA | Anton Pelser | Destruction |
19/07/2013 to 31/07/2014 |
393 | SAHRA | Stephany Potze | Export (Temporary) |
03/03/2005 to 01/03/2006 |
395 | SAHRA | David Morris | Sampling |
08/03/2005 to 01/04/2006 |
396 | SAHRA | David Morris | Export (Temporary) |
08/03/2005 to 01/04/2006 |
399 | SAHRA | H van den Aardweg | Destruction |
01/08/2013 to 01/08/2014 |
399 | SAHRA | H van den Aardweg | Destruction |
01/08/2013 to 01/08/2014 |