Primary tabs
THIS IS THE ARCHIVE FOR SAHRIS 1.0
THIS SITE IS NOW AN ARCHIVE AND IS NOT SUITABLE FOR MAKING APPLICATIONS
Please be aware that no content and application creation or changes to information on this version of SAHRIS will be retained.
To make applications or utilise SAHRIS for the creation of information, please use the new site:
https://sahris.org.za
Changes to SAHRIS!
The South African Heritage Resources Information System (SAHRIS) has undergone a generational upgrade and restructure. These changes to the site include, but are not limited to:
- A new & modernised look and layout
- Improved site usage flows with respect to applications and content creation
- Improved site performance and stability
Launch for the new version of SAHRIS occurred on Monday the 30th of October 2023.
The new site can be found here:
SAHRIS | SAHRIS
Displaying 101 - 120 of 2710
PermitID | HeritageAuthority | PermitHolder | Activities | PermitDate |
---|---|---|---|---|
4185 | Amafa | Mahomed Raffi Ansur | Additions, Alteration |
17/08/2023 to 17/08/2026 |
4181 | Amafa | Zaid Yakoob Paruk | Demolition | 15/08/2023 |
4178 | Amafa | Nico Van Der Merwe | Alteration, Additions |
14/08/2023 to 14/08/2026 |
4177 | Amafa | Seshen Govender | Additions, Alteration |
11/08/2023 to 11/08/2026 |
4100 | SAHRA | Beyond Heritage | Excavation |
08/08/2023 to 09/08/2024 |
4174 | Amafa | Timothy Parent, Helen Parent | Additions, Alteration |
08/08/2023 to 08/08/2026 |
4175 | Amafa | Elizabeth Dittmar Oehrle | Additions, Alteration |
08/08/2023 to 08/08/2026 |
4172 | Amafa | Grace Nontuthuzelo Mavundla | Alteration | 04/08/2023 |
4173 | Amafa | Thomas Butterworth | Additions, Alteration |
04/08/2023 to 04/08/2026 |
4167 | Amafa | Henk Steyn | Use equipment on site |
03/08/2023 to 03/08/2026 |
4169 | Amafa | Bilal Joosab | Additions |
03/08/2023 to 03/08/2026 |
4170 | Amafa | Hugh Murcell | Additions, Alteration |
03/08/2023 to 03/08/2026 |
4165 | Amafa | Mohamed Ahmed Simjee | Additions, Alteration | 02/08/2023 |
4162 | Amafa | A. S Marimuthu | Additions, Alteration |
01/08/2023 to 01/08/2026 |
4161 | Amafa | Suhail Agjee | Demolition |
31/07/2023 to 31/07/2026 |
4159 | Amafa | Prince Lucky Ndlovu | Demolition |
31/07/2023 to 31/07/2026 |
4160 | Amafa | Ahmed M. Hansa | Additions, Alteration |
31/07/2023 to 31/07/2026 |
4151 | SAHRA | Anton Pelser, Christine Van Wyk Rowe | Remove from its original position |
28/07/2023 to 29/07/2024 |
4153 | Amafa | Johannes Petrus De Villiers | Additions |
28/07/2023 to 28/07/2026 |
4154 | Amafa | CHOCKALINGUM SOOBRAMONEY GRAMANI | Additions, Alteration |
28/07/2023 to 28/07/2026 |