Primary tabs
THIS IS THE ARCHIVE FOR SAHRIS 1.0
THIS SITE IS NOW AN ARCHIVE AND IS NOT SUITABLE FOR MAKING APPLICATIONS
Please be aware that no content and application creation or changes to information on this version of SAHRIS will be retained.
To make applications or utilise SAHRIS for the creation of information, please use the new site:
https://sahris.org.za
Changes to SAHRIS!
The South African Heritage Resources Information System (SAHRIS) has undergone a generational upgrade and restructure. These changes to the site include, but are not limited to:
- A new & modernised look and layout
- Improved site usage flows with respect to applications and content creation
- Improved site performance and stability
Launch for the new version of SAHRIS occurred on Monday the 30th of October 2023.
The new site can be found here:
SAHRIS | SAHRIS
Displaying 221 - 240 of 2710
PermitID | HeritageAuthority | PermitHolder | Activities | PermitDate |
---|---|---|---|---|
444 | SAHRA | M Fullard | Remove from its original position |
24/06/2005 to 01/07/2008 |
445 | SAHRA | M Fullard | Remove from its original position |
24/06/2005 to 01/07/2008 |
446 | SAHRA | M Fullard | Remove from its original position |
24/06/2005 to 01/07/2008 |
447 | Amafa | Mohamed Khan | Demolition |
10/07/2013 to 10/07/2016 |
448 | Amafa | Clive Dwarika | Alteration, Additions |
10/07/2013 to 10/07/2016 |
449 | SAHRA | Lucinda Ruth Backwell | Excavation |
11/07/2005 to 01/08/2008 |
450 | SAHRA | M Dores Cruz | Collection, Sampling |
11/07/2005 to 01/08/2006 |
451 | Amafa | Heeralal Harrilal Mocktar | Alteration, Additions |
11/07/2013 to 11/07/2016 |
452 | SAHRA | GJ Susino | Excavation |
11/07/2005 to 01/08/2006 |
453 | SAHRA | Udo Kusel | Excavation |
19/07/2005 to 01/08/2006 |
454 | SAHRA | MH Alex Schoeman | Excavation |
11/07/2005 to 01/08/2006 |
455 | Amafa | Duncan MacNicol, Wendy Smith ( MacNicol) | Additions, Alteration |
11/07/2013 to 11/07/2016 |
456 | Amafa | Paul David Nel, Claire Nel | Alteration, Additions |
11/07/2013 to 11/07/2016 |
457 | SAHRA | Lee R. Berger | Collection |
28/06/2005 to 01/07/2006 |
458 | Amafa | Bradley Coucom | Alteration, Additions |
11/07/2013 to 11/07/2016 |
459 | SAHRA | A Pelser Archaeological Consulting | Remove from its original position |
20/07/2005 to 01/08/2006 |
460 | Amafa | Rosewood Body Corporate | Alteration |
11/07/2013 to 11/07/2016 |
461 | SAHRA | Jeremy Hollmann | Sampling |
19/07/2005 to 01/08/2006 |
462 | SAHRA | D McGuinness | Destruction |
19/07/2005 to 01/08/2006 |
463 | SAHRA | Lionel Donnelly | Destruction |
30/06/2005 to 01/07/2006 |