Primary tabs
THIS IS THE ARCHIVE FOR SAHRIS 1.0
THIS SITE IS NOW AN ARCHIVE AND IS NOT SUITABLE FOR MAKING APPLICATIONS
Please be aware that no content and application creation or changes to information on this version of SAHRIS will be retained.
To make applications or utilise SAHRIS for the creation of information, please use the new site:
https://sahris.org.za
Changes to SAHRIS!
The South African Heritage Resources Information System (SAHRIS) has undergone a generational upgrade and restructure. These changes to the site include, but are not limited to:
- A new & modernised look and layout
- Improved site usage flows with respect to applications and content creation
- Improved site performance and stability
Launch for the new version of SAHRIS occurred on Monday the 30th of October 2023.
The new site can be found here:
SAHRIS | SAHRIS
Displaying 121 - 140 of 2710
PermitID | HeritageAuthority | PermitHolder | Activities | PermitDate |
---|---|---|---|---|
313 | Amafa | Camden Bay Investments 39 (Pty) Ltd | Additions |
10/06/2013 to 10/06/2016 |
314 | Amafa | Cabriprop Properties NOZ cc | Additions |
10/06/2013 to 10/06/2016 |
315 | Amafa | Jo Boulle | Additions, Alteration |
10/06/2013 to 10/06/2016 |
319 | SAHRA | Harriet Clift |
11/06/2013 to 11/06/2014 |
|
320 | Amafa | MR B J F HATCH | Alteration, Additions |
12/06/2013 to 12/06/2016 |
321 | Amafa | G G BURNE | Additions, Alteration |
12/06/2013 to 12/06/2016 |
322 | LIHRA | Jakobus C Jansen | Demolition |
05/06/2013 to 05/06/2016 |
323 | Amafa | Additions, Alteration |
12/06/2013 to 12/06/2016 |
|
324 | SAHRA | Ruiko Kawaguchi | Filming |
13/06/2013 to 20/06/2014 |
326 | Amafa | E van der Linde, N van der Linde | Additions, Alteration |
13/06/2013 to 13/06/2016 |
327 | Amafa | Michael Graham, Gayle Graham | Alteration, Additions |
13/06/2013 to 13/06/2016 |
329 | Amafa | P H Blount | Alteration, Additions |
13/06/2013 to 13/06/2016 |
330 | SAHRA | Jean-Pierre Celliers | Destruction |
31/03/2005 to 01/04/2006 |
330 | SAHRA | Jean-Pierre Celliers | Destruction |
31/03/2005 to 01/04/2006 |
331 | Amafa | Brian Mitchell, Clifton School | Additions |
13/06/2013 to 13/06/2016 |
332 | SAHRA | Ruiko Kawaguchi | Filming |
13/06/2013 to 20/06/2014 |
336 | SAHRA | Stephany Potze | Export (Temporary) |
01/09/2013 to 31/08/2014 |
339 | Amafa | Balduinof Silva Bwanga, eThekwini Metropolitan Municipality | Alteration, Additions |
14/06/2013 to 14/06/2016 |
346 | SAHRA | Andre Dippenaar | Destruction |
02/05/2012 to 01/05/2015 |
347 | SAHRA | Hennie Herbst | Destruction |
03/05/2012 to 01/05/2015 |