Primary tabs
THIS IS THE ARCHIVE FOR SAHRIS 1.0
THIS SITE IS NOW AN ARCHIVE AND IS NOT SUITABLE FOR MAKING APPLICATIONS
Please be aware that no content and application creation or changes to information on this version of SAHRIS will be retained.
To make applications or utilise SAHRIS for the creation of information, please use the new site:
https://sahris.org.za
Changes to SAHRIS!
The South African Heritage Resources Information System (SAHRIS) has undergone a generational upgrade and restructure. These changes to the site include, but are not limited to:
- A new & modernised look and layout
- Improved site usage flows with respect to applications and content creation
- Improved site performance and stability
Launch for the new version of SAHRIS occurred on Monday the 30th of October 2023.
The new site can be found here:
SAHRIS | SAHRIS
Displaying 201 - 220 of 2710
PermitID | HeritageAuthority | PermitHolder | Activities | PermitDate |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | SAHRA | M Wylie | Destruction |
22/06/2005 to 01/07/2006 |
421 | SAHRA | Peter Nilssen | Export (Permanent) |
22/06/2005 to 01/07/2006 |
423 | Amafa | Demolition |
08/07/2013 to 08/07/2016 |
|
424 | Amafa | Brian Dickason, T Dickason | Additions, Alteration |
08/07/2013 to 08/07/2016 |
425 | SAHRA | Peter Nilssen | Export (Permanent) |
21/06/2005 to 01/07/2006 |
426 | Amafa | Dave Smith | Additions, Alteration |
08/07/2013 to 08/07/2016 |
427 | SAHRA | Lucinda Ruth Backwell | Excavation |
13/07/2005 to 01/07/2008 |
428 | SAHRA | Stephany Potze | Export (Temporary) |
10/06/2005 to 01/07/2006 |
431 | SAHRA | V Schormann | Destruction |
18/07/2005 to 01/08/2006 |
432 | SAHRA | V Schormann | Destruction |
31/08/2005 to 01/09/2006 |
433 | SAHRA | Collection, Excavation |
14/07/2005 to 01/08/2006 |
|
434 | SAHRA | P Venter | Destruction |
19/07/2005 to 01/08/2006 |
435 | Amafa | Gildford Investments (PTY) LTD, Hassim Akoob | Demolition |
09/07/2013 to 09/07/2016 |
436 | Amafa | Vijay Jayantilal Patel | Alteration, Additions |
09/07/2013 to 09/07/2016 |
438 | Amafa | Demolition |
09/07/2013 to 09/07/2016 |
|
439 | SAHRA | Mary Patrick | Excavation |
18/05/2005 to 01/06/2006 |
440 | SAHRA | Lionel Donnelly | Destruction |
25/05/2005 to 01/06/2006 |
441 | SAHRA | Willem Coenraad Nienaber | Remove from its original position |
26/05/2005 to 01/06/2006 |
442 | Amafa | Mancosa college | Additions, Alteration |
10/07/2013 to 10/07/2016 |
443 | SAHRA | Lindsay Hooper | Export (Temporary) |
26/05/2005 to 01/06/2006 |