Primary tabs
THIS IS THE ARCHIVE FOR SAHRIS 1.0
THIS SITE IS NOW AN ARCHIVE AND IS NOT SUITABLE FOR MAKING APPLICATIONS
Please be aware that no content and application creation or changes to information on this version of SAHRIS will be retained.
To make applications or utilise SAHRIS for the creation of information, please use the new site:
https://sahris.org.za
Changes to SAHRIS!
The South African Heritage Resources Information System (SAHRIS) has undergone a generational upgrade and restructure. These changes to the site include, but are not limited to:
- A new & modernised look and layout
- Improved site usage flows with respect to applications and content creation
- Improved site performance and stability
Launch for the new version of SAHRIS occurred on Monday the 30th of October 2023.
The new site can be found here:
SAHRIS | SAHRIS
Displaying 41 - 60 of 3926
PermitID | HeritageAuthority | PermitHolder | Activities | PermitDate |
---|---|---|---|---|
3205 | Amafa | Gerrit Leendert Dusseldorp | Analysis, Export (Temporary) |
08/02/2021 to 08/02/2024 |
219 | SAHRA | Linda Mbeki | Export (Permanent) | 11/03/2013 |
219 | SAHRA | Linda Mbeki | Export (Permanent) | 11/03/2013 |
219 | SAHRA | Linda Mbeki | Export (Permanent) | 11/03/2013 |
251 | SAHRA | Christopher Henshilwood | Export (Permanent) | 07/05/2013 |
251 | SAHRA | Christopher Henshilwood | Export (Permanent) | 07/05/2013 |
260 | SAHRA | Lee R. Berger | Export (Temporary) |
13/05/2013 to 31/05/2014 |
273 | SAHRA | Roger Smith | Export (Temporary) |
23/05/2013 to 01/06/2014 |
335 | SAHRA | Stephany Potze | Export (Temporary) |
01/09/2013 to 31/08/2014 |
336 | SAHRA | Stephany Potze | Export (Temporary) |
01/09/2013 to 31/08/2014 |
336 | SAHRA | Stephany Potze | Export (Temporary) |
01/09/2013 to 31/08/2014 |
480 | SAHRA | Michael Chazan | Export (Temporary) |
16/07/2013 to 16/07/2016 |
480 | SAHRA | Michael Chazan | Export (Temporary) |
16/07/2013 to 16/07/2016 |
480 | SAHRA | Michael Chazan | Export (Temporary) |
16/07/2013 to 16/07/2016 |
480 | SAHRA | Michael Chazan | Export (Temporary) |
16/07/2013 to 16/07/2016 |
480 | SAHRA | Michael Chazan | Export (Temporary) |
16/07/2013 to 16/07/2016 |
505 | SAHRA | Kathleen Kuman, Morris B. Sutton | Export for Geological Samples |
19/07/2013 to 31/07/2014 |
526 | SAHRA | Colin Menter | Export (Permanent), Destruction |
01/08/2013 to 01/08/2016 |
581 | SAHRA | Christine Sievers, Lyn Wadley | Export (Permanent) |
20/08/2013 to 31/08/2014 |
611 | SAHRA | Guillaume Porraz | Export (Temporary) |
27/08/2013 to 31/08/2014 |